Oreopoulos, Dimitrios George (CPSO#: 30581)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Oct 2011