Oreopoulos, George Dimitrios (CPSO#: 70346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
6 Eaton North Room 216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3275
Fax: (416) 340-5029
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George D. Oreopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Oreopoulos ( CPSO# 70346 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
6 Eaton North Room 216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3275

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE DIMITRIOS OREOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2004