Orfaly, Robert Med (CPSO#: 63626)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2005