Orfi, Jan Niel Ezel (CPSO#: 66046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300-1
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 6
Fax: (905) 338-3607
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Palermo Professional Centre
Suite 340
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 802
Fax: (905) 582-5423
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Canada
Phone: 905 849-4567 Ext. 822
Fax: 905 582-4500
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orfi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2008


Corporation Name: Brien Orfi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Orfi ( CPSO# 66046 )
Dr. H. Brien ( CPSO# 67428 )

Business Address:
Suite 409
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
300-1 - 690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
Palermo Professional Centre
340/480 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 339-2498

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Feb 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN NIEL EZEL ORFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORFI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1992