Organek, Andrew Jordan (CPSO#: 84690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Organek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Organek ( CPSO# 84690 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JORDAN ORGANEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORGANEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008