Orizaga, Manuel (CPSO#: 22542)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997