Orkin, Julia Beth Spring (CPSO#: 86355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: Morinis, Julia Beth Spring (used until: 17 Dec 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Room 10210 10th Floor
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201150
Fax: (416) 813-5663
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA BETH SPRING ORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 08 Apr 2011 to 07 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011