Ornstein, Melanie Patrice (CPSO#: 70349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 466-2360
Fax: (416) 466-5076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Ornstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ornstein ( CPSO# 70349 )

Business Address:
311 - 658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (416) 466-2360

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE PATRICE ORNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On November 26, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of malpractice was made against Dr. Melanie Ornstein.