Oroz, Irina (CPSO#: 100146)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2013