Orr, James Frederick (CPSO#: 24724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone: (905) 306-9229
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James F. Orr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Orr ( CPSO# 24724 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone Number: (905) 949-0344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FREDERICK ORR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Oct 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1974