Orr, Pamela Hutchins (CPSO#: 51857)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1981 to 28 Oct 1981
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1983 to 29 Apr 1983
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Apr 2007