Orr, Richard James (CPSO#: 63778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1360 20th Street East
P O Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5N3
Phone: (519) 371-8096
Fax: (519) 371-5631
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard J. Orr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Orr ( CPSO# 63778 )

Business Address:
1360 20th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5N3
Phone Number: (519) 371-8096

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES ORR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992