Orrantia, Eliseo (CPSO#: 66558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 399
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: (807) 229-2672
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orrantia and Newbery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2004

Dr. E. Orrantia ( CPSO# 66558 )
Dr. S. Newbery ( CPSO# 66686 )

Business Address:
Marathon Family Health Team
Box 399
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-3243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ELISEO ORRANTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORRANTIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1995