Orsini, Silvia Antonella (CPSO#: 74936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone: (519) 432-4107
Fax: (519) 432-6921
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Oct 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SILVIA ANTONELLA ORSINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORSINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2002 to 08 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2002