Ortiz, Jon Hernandez (CPSO#: 66282)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 05 Apr 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 05 Apr 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 05 Apr 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 06 Jan 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2001