Ortiz-Luis, Louie Crespo (CPSO#: 56012)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2013