Oryema, John Uma (CPSO#: 54069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Acholi, English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
2416 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2P3
Phone: (416) 750-1222
Fax: (416) 750-0751
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Uma Oryema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oryema ( CPSO# 54069 )

Business Address:
Kennedy-Eglinton Medical Centre
2nd Floor
2416 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2P3
Phone Number: (416) 750-1222

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN UMA ORYEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORYEMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1985