Osagie, Ofure Elsie (CPSO#: 94506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Lagos, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Advanced Medical Group
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone: (519) 8731615
Fax: 519-8731717
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

155 clarke road
London ON  N5W 5C9
Canada
Phone: 5194551100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O.E. Osagie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Osagie ( CPSO# 94506 )

Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
London ON  L6A 2C2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OFURE ELSIE OSAGIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSAGIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2012