Osak, Roberta (CPSO#: 62313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: Cohn, Roberta (used until: 26 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 707-5678
Fax: (905) 264-7310
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Osak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Osak ( CPSO# 62313 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 707-5678

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTA OSAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991