Osborn, Alexander Justin (CPSO#: 94173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 May 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Baylor College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Voice Clinic
Suite 2003
180 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z8
Phone: (647) 361-8182
Fax: (647) 361-8189
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Otolaryngology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 14 May 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 May 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Alexander   Justin   Osborn   may   practise  medicine  independently  in
            otolaryngology.