Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Osborne, Cynthia Ann (CPSO#: 58666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
785 Wonderland Road South,Suite200
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cynthia A. Osborne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Osborne ( CPSO# 58666 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
785 Wonderland Road South
Suite 200
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ANN OSBORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSBORNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987