Osborne, Edward James (CPSO#: 66499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Osborne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Osborne ( CPSO# 66499 )

Business Address:
3100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD JAMES OSBORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSBORNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995