Osborne, Ronald Julian (CPSO#: 21559)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1998