Osen, Charles Sheridan (CPSO#: 29633)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004