Osman, Said (CPSO#: 68783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 105
450 central avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270
Fax: (519) 672-4459
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Canada
Phone: (519) 245-1550 Ext. 5624
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

24 Huron St. West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Canada
Phone: (519) 235-2700
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8689
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

21 McGivern St. W. Box 1300
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Canada
Phone: (519) 881-1220
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Said Osman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Osman ( CPSO# 68783 )

Business Address:
South Bruce Grey Health Centre
21 McGivern Street West
Box 1300
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-1220

Business Address:
104 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-5270

Business Address:
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone Number: (519) 657-8246

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 913-7900

Business Address:
1657 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 3C6
Phone Number: (519) 659-4158

Business Address:
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H1
Phone Number: (519) 438-8131

Business Address:
RR5
22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 264-2800

Business Address:
RR 3
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Business Address:
South Huron Hospital
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
PO Box 5777
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6035

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
PO Box 2030
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8323

Business Address:
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Business Address:
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Business Address:
43 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Phone Number: (519) 396-3331

Business Address:
90 - 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Business Address:
39 - 2nd Street S.E.
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 363-2340

Business Address:
320 College Street
Box 638
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 369-2340

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAID OSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000