Osmond, Mark Kilburn (CPSO#: 101772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Health Sciences Centre
Dept Obstetrics & Gynaecology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Feb 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mark Kilburn Osmond may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Obstetrics & Gynaecology, Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine,
                        McMaster University, in which Dr. Osmond holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Osmond no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Osmond's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Osmond's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on February 1, 2018, and expires on June 30,
                  2021.  Upon renewal of Dr. Osmond's academic appointment at McMaster
                  University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.