Osmond, Martin Henry (CPSO#: 56913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of Eastern Onta
Division Of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2957
Fax: (613) 738-4885
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Osmond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Osmond ( CPSO# 56913 )
Dr. J. Nuth ( CPSO# 57077 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN HENRY OSMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSMOND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991