Osoro, Beatrice Kwamboka (CPSO#: 87836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Swahili

Education:Voronez State Medical Academy, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgina Family Medical Centre
417 The Queensway South, Suite 201
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone: (905) 989-7800
Fax: (905) 535-7800
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beatrice Osoro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Osoro ( CPSO# 87836 )

Business Address:
Georgina Family Medical Centre
Suite 201
417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone Number: (905) 989-7800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEATRICE KWAMBOKA OSORO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSORO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010