Ostapenko, Elena (CPSO#: 74913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stoney Creek Walk in Clinic
Suite 2A
140 Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 1H9
Phone: (905) 561-9255
Fax: (905) 561-4391
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ostapenko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ostapenko ( CPSO# 74913 )

Business Address:
Stoney Creek Walk in Clinic
Suite 2A
140 Centennial Parkway North
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 1H9
Phone Number: (905) 561-9255

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA OSTAPENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTAPENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002