Osten, Mark David (CPSO#: 75254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
Eaton Wing - 6th floor rm 238
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4615
Fax: (416) 340-4144
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Medical Associates
491 Lawrence Ave west
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 621-2800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Osten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chodirker ( CPSO# 79031 )
Dr. M. Osten ( CPSO# 75254 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
6EN-Rm 232B
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4615

Business Address:
302 - 1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4

Business Address:
500 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Business Address:
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8L 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220


Corporation Name: Lisa Chodirker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chodirker ( CPSO# 79031 )
Dr. M. Osten ( CPSO# 75254 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
6th Floor Room 238
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4615

Business Address:
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2 - 039
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5847

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID OSTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004