Ostermann, Maria Elisabeth (CPSO#: 70847)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1996 to 31 Aug 1997
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998