Ostic, Heather Ann (CPSO#: 68961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southeastern Ontario Regional
Cancer Centre
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4505
Fax: (613) 546-8209
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANN OSTIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1998