Ostro, Helen (CPSO#: 58264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2033 Crooks Road
Royal Oak MI  48073
United States
Phone: (248) 543-2000
Fax: (248) 543-2043

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN OSTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTRO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1988