Ostrowski, John Dennis (CPSO#: 62238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5400 Portage Road
Suite 301
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Phone: (905) 356-8333
Fax: (905) 356-1702
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. Ostrowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ostrowski ( CPSO# 62238 )

Business Address:
5400 Portage Road
Suite 301
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Phone Number: (905) 356-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DENNIS OSTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991