Ostrowski, Marian Antoni (CPSO#: 54074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 4CC 180
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Fax: (416) 864-5310
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ostrowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ostrowski ( CPSO# 54074 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
4CC 180 - 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5568

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAN ANTONI OSTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987