Osuntokun, Oluwatosin Abimbola (CPSO#: 108228)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
South 6-414 Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4755
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 23 Jan 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2017