Othman, Sahar Shafik A (CPSO#: 108169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 11 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave. East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAHAR SHAFIK A OTHMAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. OTHMAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. OTHMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. OTHMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. OTHMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. OTHMAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. OTHMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 10 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018