Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Otoo, Andrew Amukwei (CPSO#: 27851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1975

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2346 Kingston Road
Suite 101
Scarborough ON  M1N 1V2
Phone: (416) 264-3268
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW AMUKWEI OTOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTOO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1975
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Jan 1997
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 25 Feb 1997

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 1996
Summary:

 In June 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Otoo guilty of professional misconduct as defined 
 in Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 29(33).

The Committee 
 ordered the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Otoo was to be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand 
 to be recorded on the Register.

2.	Dr. Otoo(s certificate of registration was to be suspended for 
 a period of three months, commencing within 60 days of the Order becoming final.

3.	The last two 
 months of the suspension is to be suspended provided that Dr. Otoo complete at his own expense, to 
 the satisfactory of the Registrar, within 8 months of the Order becoming final;

(a)	The College(s 
 course on communication skills with the particular emphasis on gender sensitivity and patient 
 autonomy; and 

(b)	A dialogue with a medical ethecist acceptable to the Registrar for a minimum 
 of five- two hour sessions, which sessions shall include counselling patients, who are victims of 
 domestic abuse and the issue of the paternalism in the doctor/patient relationship.

4.	A copy of 
 the Committee(s reasons for decision is to be delivered to the provider of each course.

5.	If the 
 said conditions are not met within the said eight months, the remaining two months suspension 
 shall be served starting no later than 8 months from the Order becoming final.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 21, 1995