Otremba, Mirek Miroslaw (CPSO#: 70350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 431
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3823
Fax: (416) 586-3186
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Otremba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Otremba ( CPSO# 70350 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
431 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIREK MIROSLAW OTREMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTREMBA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000