Otsuka, Norman Yoshinobu (CPSO#: 59679)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2007