Ott, Carol Louise Baunemann (CPSO#: 87906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2636
Fax: (416) 785-2863
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5N 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6407
Fax: (416) 323-6215
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Ott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ott ( CPSO# 87906 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6407

Business Address:
Baycrest
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL LOUISE BAUNEMANN OTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010