Ou Hingwan, Gilbert (CPSO#: 22081)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gilbert Ou Hingwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011