Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ou, Yvonne (CPSO#: 69820)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1996