Ouchterlony, David Powell (CPSO#: 20812)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Feb 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2018