Ouellette, Jean Louis Gerard (CPSO#: 54897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Spence Avenue
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 0B4
Phone: (844) 304-1414
Fax: (613) 632-4791
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Professional Centre
1 Main Street East
Suite 200
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A1
Canada
Phone: (613) 363-2643
Fax: (613) 632-5369
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean Ouellette Societe Professionnelle de Medecine

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ouellette ( CPSO# 54897 )

Business Address:
1 Main Street
Suite 200
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 632-4135

Business Address:
580 Spence Avenue
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 0B4
Phone Number: (844) 304-1414

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN LOUIS GERARD OUELLETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLETTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1984