Ouellette, Jean-Paul (CPSO#: 23809)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Orleans Clinic of Orthopaedic Medicine Unit 206 2555 St Joseph Boulevard Orleans, ON K1C 1S6
Date Received: 20 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017