Ouellette, Yves (CPSO#: 62645)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2004