Ouzounian, Maral (CPSO#: 85765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Room 4N-464
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4218
Fax: (416) 340-4580
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maral Ouzounian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ouzounian ( CPSO# 85765 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 4N-464
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4218

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARAL OUZOUNIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUZOUNIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2013