Ovens, Howard Jack (CPSO#: 31485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 May 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department (Room 438)
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8226
Fax: (416) 586-5218
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard Ovens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ovens ( CPSO# 31485 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Room 206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8226

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD JACK OVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OVENS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1980