Owayed, Abdullah Farhan Mashay (CPSO#: 67354)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Nov 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 1998